IL HB3320 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Occupational Licensing Reform Act. Provides that an individual with a criminal history may petition the responsible licensing board, at any time, including before obtaining any required education or paying any fee, for a determination of whether the individual's criminal history will disqualify the individual from obtaining State recognition. Provides that the Governor shall establish the Office of Supervision of Occupational Boards, which will be responsible for actively supervising State occupational boards to ensure compliance with the State's policies. Provides that the Office must review and approve or reject any proposed board rule, policy, enforcement, or other regulatory action prior to it being adopted or implemented. Amends the Departments of State Government Article of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. In provisions concerning temporary licenses to service members or spouses of service members, provides that the director of a department must issue or deny a license within the 6-month period of the temporary license. Provides that upon denial of a license, the department must provide specific information explaining the denial and a course of action for the applicant to receive licensure. Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Allows for the issuance of multistate licenses that allow nurses to practice in his or her home state and other compact states. Ratifies and approves the Nurse Licensure Compact. Provides that the Compact does not supersede existing State labor laws. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OCCUPATIONAL LICENSE REFORM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2055-715Amended CodeCitation Text
2256585-10New CodeSee Bill Text
2256585-5New CodeSee Bill Text
22565Art. 85 headingNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback