IL HB3309 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Workforce Innovation Board Act. Provides that, by December 31, 2024, the Illinois Workforce Innovation Board must publish a report to identify strategies to address transportation access barriers that current secondary and community college students encounter when trying to access career development experiences and apprenticeship opportunities. Effective immediately.
Title
WORKFORCE INNOVATION REPORT
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Kevin Schmidt [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] |
Rep. Jackie Haas [R] | Rep. Dave Vella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2023-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2023-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2023-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3975 | 4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3309&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3309.htm |