IL HB3298 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With respect to the annual budget of a school district with under 500,000 inhabitants, provides that, beginning with the budget for the 2017-2018 school year, 85% of State funding under the State aid formula provisions of the Code must be dedicated to objects and purposes related to classroom teaching. Provides that the State Board of Education shall, by rule, determine which objects and purposes are related to classroom teaching.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-BUDGET-CLASSRM TEACHING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0550
2017-11-09HouseEffective Date November 8, 2017
2017-11-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-11-08HouseBoth Houses Override Total Veto
2017-11-08SenateOverride Governor Veto - Senate Passed 053-000-000
2017-11-08Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-07SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Andy Manar
2017-11-01SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto
2017-10-25HouseOverride Governor Veto - House Passed 110-000-000
2017-10-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-12HouseMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-10-12HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2017-08-25HouseGovernor Vetoed
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Education; 013-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Education
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-001-000
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-15HouseRe-assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105517-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3298&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3298.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3298eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3298enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3298gms.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0550.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3298ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3298ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3298ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3298_04282017_043000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB3298_05302017_058000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3298_10252017_023000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB3298_11082017_007000M.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback