IL HB3296 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption also applies to persons with a disability. Amends the State Mandates Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SR FREEZE-DISABILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.28Amended CodeCitation Text
3520015-10Amended CodeCitation Text
3520015-172Amended CodeCitation Text
3520015-175Amended CodeCitation Text
352009-275Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback