IL HB3296 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wireless Emergency Telephone Safety Act. Provides that the definition of "wireless telephone service" includes wireless enhanced 911 service, wireline enhanced 911 service, interconnected VoIP provider service as defined by the regulations set forth by the Federal Communications Commission, IP-enabled service, and prepaid wireless service. Requires that beginning on July 1, 2013, all public safety answering points must provide Phase II wireless services for at least 50% of their carriers. Further provides that surcharges collected and remitted on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, shall be deposited into the Wireless Service Emergency Fund, totalling $0.73 per surcharge. Provides that the Wireless Service Emergency Fund is not subject to sweeps that would in any way transfer any funds into any other fund of the State. Removes a provision repealing the Wireless Emergency Telephone Safety Act on April 1, 2013. Effective immediately.
Title
WIRELESS EMERGENCY PHONE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-04-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2011-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2011-03-28 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2011-03-28 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 15, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2011-03-07 | House | Re-assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 751 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 751 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 751 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 751 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 751 | 70 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |