IL HB3294 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any person convicted of a first violation of aggravated fleeing or attempting to elude a peace office shall be guilty of a Class 4 felony for which the person shall be sentenced to a term of imprisonment of not less than 1 year and not more than 3 years and any person convicted of a second or subsequent violation of the offense shall be guilty of a Class 3 felony for which the person shall be sentenced to a term of imprisonment of not less than 2 years and not more than 5 years. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-FLEEING A PEACE OFFICER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-15HouseTo Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-204.1Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback