IL HB3293 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that whenever a school bus is operated for the purpose of transporting passengers other than persons in connection with an activity of the school or religious organization which owns the bus or whenever a school district or a school bus company under contract with a school district discards a school bus through sale or donation, the "SCHOOL BUS" signs and any other insignia or words indicating that the vehicle is a school bus shall be removed, covered, or concealed, the stop signal arm and flashing signal system shall not be operable through normal controls, and the bus shall be painted a color different from the colors required for a school bus under the Code.
Title
VEH CD-SCHOOLBUS-IDENTIFCATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0277 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-010-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-002-001 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 078-037-001 |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-002-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-004-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-806 | Amended Code | Citation Text |