IL HB3292 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Property Control Act. Provides that all airplanes and helicopters owned by the State, except those designated for emergency use and those used by a public university as part of a course in aviation, are surplus property and must be sold by a competitive sealed bid method (now, a transferable airplane may be disposed of only if (i) it is no longer needed, (ii) it will not be used as a trade-in, and (iii) a public university or college offering aviation-related instruction or training has not listed its need for an airplane). Requires that the sale proceeds be deposited into the Education Assistance Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROPERTY CONTROL-STATE PLANES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-04-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017
2017-03-31HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
306057.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback