IL HB3274 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Fair Act. Provides that income derived from the sale of advertising at the DuQuoin State Fair shall be deposited into the Illinois State Fair Fund (rather than the Agricultural Premium Fund). Provides that all revenues from the operation and use of any facilities at the DuQuoin State Fair and the DuQuoin State Fairgrounds shall be deposited in the Illinois State Fair Fund (rather than the Agricultural Premium Fund). Provides that all funds in the Illinois State Fair Fund shall be used by the Department of Agriculture in accordance with appropriation by the General Assembly for operation of the Illinois State Fair and the DuQuoin State Fair (rather than solely the Illinois State Fair). Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
AGRICULTURE-STATE FAIRS
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
Rep. Sara Jimenez [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1174 |
2019-01-10 | House | Effective Date January 10, 2019 |
2019-01-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-12-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-11-29 | House | House Concurs |
2018-11-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-000-001 |
2018-11-29 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-11-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-11-15 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-11-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-11-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2018-11-15 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 15, 2018 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2018-11-05 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 210 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 210 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |