IL HB3274 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fish and Aquatic Life Code. Commencing with the 2012 license year, sets (i) the fishing license fee for resident veterans after returning from service abroad or mobilization by the President at one-half of the fishing license fee for residents and (ii) the sportsmen's combination license fee at one-half of the sportsmen's combination license fee for residents. Requires veterans to provide verification of their service. Authorizes the Department of Natural Resources to establish what constitutes suitable verification of service for the purpose of issuing these licenses to resident veterans at a reduced fee. Amends the Wildlife Code. Commencing with the 2012 license year, sets the hunting license fee for resident veterans after returning from service abroad or mobilization by the President at one-half of the hunting license fee for residents. Requires veterans to provide verification of their service. Authorizes the Department of Natural Resources to establish what constitutes suitable verification of service for the purpose of issuing hunting licenses to resident veterans at a reduced fee. Effective April 1, 2012.
Title
WILDLIFE-VETERAN-FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0498 |
2011-08-22 | House | Effective Date April 1, 2012 |
2011-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
2011-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-000-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2011-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2011-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2011-05-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2011 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture and Conservation; 009-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2011-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2011-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2011-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2011-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2011-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2011-04-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2011-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 |
2011-04-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-01 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2011-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Barickman |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
515 | 5 | 20-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |