IL HB3263 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Independent Tax Tribunal Act of 2012. Expands the jurisdiction of the Tribunal to include the County Motor Fuel Tax Law, the Live Adult Entertainment Facility Surcharge Act, the Vehicle Use Tax, the Metropolitan Pier & Exposition Authority Food and Beverage Tax, the Tire User Fee, the Chicago Soft Drink Tax, the Drycleaning Solvent Tax, the Energy Assistance Act of 1989, and the Qualified Solid Waste Fee. Provides a transition schedule for the expansion of jurisdiction. Provides for additional procedures, including automatic remand, and a reduced filing fee for certain cases. Effective immediately.
Title
TAX TRIBUNAL-JURISDICTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-03-09 | House | To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 1010 | 1-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 1010 | 1-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 1010 | 1-51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 1010 | 1-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 1010 | 1-63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |