IL HB3262 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that the Illinois Community College Board may collect a fee to cover the cost of processing and handling individual student-level data requests pursuant to an approved data sharing agreement. Renames the ICCB Instructional Development and Enhancement Applications Revolving Fund to the ICCB Research and Technology Fund. Provides that the Fund shall receive all moneys received from processing requests for individual student-level data, and that money from the Fund shall be used for costs associated with maintaining and updating individual student-level data systems. Amends the State Finance Act to make a conforming change. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ICCB-RESEARCH & TECH FUND

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Community College Access & Affordability Committee; 007-000-000
2017-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Community College Access & Affordability Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Community College Access & Affordability Committee; 007-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Community College Access & Affordability Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Community College Access & Affordability Committee; 008-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Community College Access & Affordability Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1108052-11.2New CodeSee Bill Text
1108052-16.09Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.652Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback