IL HB3262 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Procurement Code. Provides that a copy of notice of all emergency procurements and all documents provided at a public hearing shall be included in the online electronic (now, subsequent Procurement) Bulletin. Provides that the State purchasing officer (now, the purchasing agency) shall publish information regarding the emergency procurement. Provides that the actual total cost of an emergency purchase shall be published no later than 5 calendar days after it is determined (now, before the 10th day of the next succeeding month). Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
PROCUREMENT-EMERGENCY PURCHASE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 60 N: 54 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-17 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2016-11-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2016-08-19 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 060-054-001 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-007-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-001-001 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 20-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |