IL HB3261 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Personnel Code. Provides that, for the purpose of veteran preferences, with respect to applicants for the position of Highway Maintainer, service in the Illinois National Guard or a reserve component of the United States Armed Forces is considered service in the Armed Forces of the United States regardless of whether or not the applicant was mobilized to active duty. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PERSONNEL-HIGHWAY MAINTAINER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 100-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 013-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-05-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-25HouseArrived in House
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Weaver
2017-05-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 014-000-000
2017-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 014-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
204158b.7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback