IL HB3260 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that all State-owned vehicles that were reported in the Performance Audit of the Department of Central Management Services' Operation of the State Vehicles Fleet released by the Office of the Auditor General in November 2011 to have been driven 7,000 miles or less in Fiscal Year 2010 or that have an odometer reading of 7,000 miles or less on the effective date of the amendatory Act are deemed surplus and shall be sold using a competitive sealed bid method of sale on or before July 1, 2013. Provides that proceeds from the sale of those vehicles shall be deposited into the General Revenue Fund. Provides that those provisions do not apply to police or emergency vehicles. Effective immediately.
Title
CMS-SELL STATE VEHICLES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-08-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sue Scherer |
2013-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2013-05-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 010-000-000 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-04-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2013-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2013-03-01 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |