IL HB3259 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-21)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
Pending: House Appropriations-Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends Public Act 99-524 to make supplemental appropriations. Reduces certain appropriations from the Commitment to Human Services Fund for funeral and burial expenses from $8,775,000 to $575,000. Appropriates $8,200,000 from the Personal Property Tax Replacement Fund for those funeral and burial expenses. Appropriates $18, 635,000 from the Commitment to Human Services Fund to the Department of Human Services for costs associated with the Domestic Violence Shelters and Services Program. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SHELTERS

Sponsors

Rep. Litesa Wallace [D]Rep. Sonya Harper [D]Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D]Rep. William Davis [D]
Rep. Juliana Stratton [D]Rep. Kathleen Willis [D]Rep. Will Guzzardi [D]Rep. Jehan Gordon [D]
Rep. Theresa Mah [D]Rep. Louis Lang [D]Rep. Camille Lilly [D]Rep. Cynthia Soto [D]
Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D]Rep. Sara Jimenez [R]Rep. Deborah Conroy [D]Rep. Silvana Tabares [D]
Rep. Linda LaVia [D]Rep. David Olsen [R]Rep. Patricia Bellock [R]Rep. Terri Bryant [R]
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D]Rep. Tony McCombie [R]Rep. Norine Hammond [R]Rep. Anna Moeller [D]
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D]Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D]Rep. Daniel Beiser [D]Rep. Sara Feigenholtz [D]
Rep. Frances Hurley [D]Rep. Robyn Gabel [D]Rep. Al Riley [D]Rep. Laura Fine [D]
Rep. James Durkin [R]Rep. Michael Halpin [D]Rep. Carol Ammons [D]Rep. Katie Stuart [D]
Rep. Timothy Butler [R]Rep. Avery Bourne [R]Rep. Michael Unes [R]Rep. Ryan Spain [R]
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D]Rep. Sue Scherer [D]Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R]Rep. Steven Andersson [R]
Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]Rep. David Welter [R]Rep. Natalie Manley [D]
Rep. Ann Williams [D]Rep. Keith Sommer [R]Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D]Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D]
Rep. Keith Wheeler [R]Rep. Martin Moylan [D]Rep. Barbara Currie [D]Rep. Marcus Evans [D]
Rep. Robert Rita [D]Rep. Daniel Swanson [R]Rep. Jay Hoffman [D]Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D]
Rep. Robert Pritchard [R]Rep. Jerry Costello [D]Rep. Brandon Phelps [D]Rep. Thomas Bennett [R]
Rep. Christian Mitchell [D]Rep. Daniel Burke [D]Rep. Luis Arroyo [D]Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D]
Rep. Emily McAsey [D]Rep. Mary Flowers [D]Rep. Robert Martwick [D]Rep. Jaime Andrade [D]
Rep. Elgie Sims [D]Rep. Tom Demmer [R]Rep. Grant Wehrli [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2017-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-24HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback