IL HB3255 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Removes obsolete language with regard to members of the Board of Higher Education, a vocational education committee, and the Tuition and Fee Waiver Task Force. Allows for the filing of electronic copies of reports to the General Assembly. Repeals provisions concerning a matching grant program to engineering colleges, a State student cooperative work program, a Parks College feasibility study, and a technology grant program. Makes technical changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BD HIGHER ED-MISC

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 007-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1102051Amended CodeCitation Text
1102052Amended CodeCitation Text
1102053Amended CodeCitation Text
1102059.03Amended CodeCitation Text
1102059.04Amended CodeCitation Text
1102059.07Amended CodeCitation Text
1102059.13Repealed CodeCitation Text
1102059.20Repealed CodeCitation Text
1102059.25Repealed CodeCitation Text
1102059.27Repealed CodeCitation Text
1102059.29Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback