IL HB3247 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits grooming when he or she knowingly, in person or by use of a computer on-line service, Internet service, local bulletin board service, or any other device capable of electronic data storage or transmission, seduces, solicits, lures, or entices, or attempts to seduce, solicit, lure, or entice, a child, a child's guardian, or another person believed by the person to be a child or a child's guardian, to commit a sex offense as defined in the Sex Offender Registration Act, distribute photographs depicting the sex organs of the child, or otherwise engage in unlawful sexual conduct with a child or with another person believed by the person to be a child.
Title
CRIM CD-GROOMING-IN PERSON
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3247&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3247.htm |