IL HB3245 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Modifies definition of "clear and present danger". Provides that an applicant for the issuance or renewal of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card shall include a full set of his or her fingerprints in electronic format to the Illinois State Police, unless the applicant has previously provided a full set of his or her fingerprints to the Illinois State Police under the Act or the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that a Firearm Owner's Identification Card issued under the Act shall be valid for the person to whom it is issued for a period of 5 years (rather than 10 years) from the date of issuance, but provides that any person whose card was previously issued for a period of 10 years shall retain the 10-year issuance period until the next date of renewal, at which point the card shall be renewed for 5 years. Provides that any transfer of a surrendered firearm must be conducted under the firearm transfer provisions of the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the Firearm Disposition Record shall contain a statement to be signed by the transferee that the transferee: (1) is aware of, and will abide by, current law regarding the unlawful transfer of a firearm; (2) is aware of the penalties for violating the law as it pertains to unlawful transfer of a firearm; and (3) intends to retain possession of the firearm or firearms until it is determined that the transferor is legally eligible to possess a firearm and has an active Firearm Owners Identification Card, if applicable, or until a new person is chosen to hold the firearm or firearms. Amends various other Acts to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID-OMNIBUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2605 | 2605-304 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-124 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 7.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
430 | 65 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 8.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
430 | 65 | 9.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
430 | 66 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 110-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3245&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3245.htm |