IL HB3237 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Requires the State Board of Education to adopt guidelines for English language proficiency for eligibility to receive a State Seal of Biliteracy. Requires the State Board to allow a student to provide his or her school district with evidence of completion of (i) an AP English Language and Composition Exam (rather than an AP English Language and Composition Exam with a score of 4 or 5), (ii) an English language arts dual credit course (rather than an English language arts dual credit course with a final grade point average of 2.0 or higher), or (iii) transitional coursework in English language arts articulated in partnership with a community college as an ESSA College and Career Readiness Indicator (rather than transitional coursework in English language arts articulated in partnership with a community college as an ESSA College and Career Readiness Indicator with a final grade point average of 2.0 or higher). Effective immediately.
Title
SCHCD-STATE SEAL OF BILITERACY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0503 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.159 | Amended Code | Citation Text |