IL HB3233 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that the presidential elector with the highest number of votes in a congressional district casts an electoral vote for the presidential and vice presidential candidates of his or her political party. Provides that an at-large presidential elector who receives the highest or second highest number of votes statewide casts an electoral vote for the candidates of his or her party.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-PRESIDENTIAL ELECTORS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-10HouseTo Election Administration Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Reginald Phillips

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10521-1Amended CodeCitation Text
10521-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback