IL HB3233 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act, a fire protection district may propose, by referendum, a special tax levy not to exceed .40% of the value of all taxable property within the district as equalized or assessed by the Department of Revenue for ambulance services. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRE PROTECTION-TAX LEVY
Sponsors
Rep. David Leitch [R] | Rep. Frank Mautino [D] | Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] | Rep. Mike Bost [R] |
Sen. Darin LaHood [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0319 |
2013-08-12 | House | Effective Date August 12, 2013 |
2013-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-001-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 012-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-039-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch |
2013-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee; 016-003-000 |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 705 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |