IL HB3216 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on October 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Departments of State Government Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that notwithstanding any law to the contrary, third-party contracts entered into by the State are permissible only when they are in the best interests of the State. Provides conditions with which to measure whether a third-party contract is in the best interests of the State. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE THIRD PARTY CONTRACTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 67 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-27HouseTotal Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
2017-10-25HouseOverride Governor Veto - House Lost 067-047-000
2017-10-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-20HouseMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-10-12HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Vetoed
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-019-000
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2017
2017-05-17SenateDo Pass Labor; 010-005-000
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-08SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 064-052-000
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-25HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-03-24HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-003-000
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2055-725New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback