IL HB3215 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires a school district to make feminine hygiene products available, at no cost to students, in the bathrooms of school buildings. Provides that this requirement also applies to charter schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-FEMININE HYGIENE PRODCT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0163
2017-08-18HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 034-016-000
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-001
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-03SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-26SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-051-000
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-22HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-006-000
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.60New CodeSee Bill Text
105527A-5Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.53New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback