IL HB3213 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In the definition of "teacher", removes a provision specifying that an annuitant receiving a retirement annuity under the Chicago Teacher Article who is employed by a board of education or other employer as permitted under specified provisions is not a "teacher" for purposes of the Downstate Teacher Article. Provides that the board may also require reporting requirements that are different than those specified in a provision concerning employer reporting requirements and may require different reporting requirements for different benefits or purposes established under the Article, including, but not limited to, any optional benefit plan an employee chooses to participate in. Provides that if the governing body of an employer that is not a State agency fails to forward specified required contributions within a specified period, the System shall notify the employer of an additional amount due, equal to $50 per day for each day that elapses from the due date until the day the report and employee contributions are received by the System (instead of the greater of an amount representing the interest lost by the system due to late forwarding of contributions, calculated for the number of days which the employer is late in forwarding contributions at a rate of interest prescribed by the board or $50). Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-DOWNSTATE TEACH-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Government Accountability and Pensions; 009-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Government Accountability and Pensions
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
2019-03-14HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael T. Marron
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-106Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-155Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback