IL HB3213 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-3)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-3)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Adds families that are not recipients of benefits under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program and that need child care assistance to participate in education and training activities to the list of family categories that are covered under the child care assistance program. Deletes a provision: requiring the Department of Human Services to allocate $7,500,000 annually for a test program for families that are income-eligible for child care assistance, are not recipients of TANF, and need child care assistance to participate in education and training activities; and requiring the Department to specify the conditions of eligibility for the test program. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
CHILD CARE-EDUCATION/TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0387 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-002-000 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 065-044-001 |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 007-005-000 |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-01 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-02-23 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |