IL HB3209 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Competitive Bidding of Local Roads, Streets, and Bridges Act. Provides that no unit of local government may make any contract, intergovernmental agreement, or any other type of agreement with another unit of local government for the maintenance or construction of local roads, streets, and bridges that would have the effect of avoiding competitive bidding required by statute. Limits applicability of the Act under specified circumstances. Limits home rule powers. Amends the Intergovernmental Cooperation Act. Provides that no intergovernmental or interagency agreement or contract may be entered into in violation of the Competitive Bidding of Local Roads, Streets, and Bridges Act and any such agreement or contract entered into after the effective date of the new Act may not be implemented or given effect.
Title
LOCAL COMPETITIVE BIDDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 220 | 4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3209&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3209.htm |