IL HB3208 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Changes the name of the Act to the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Persons under 21 Years of Age and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Raises the age for whom tobacco products, electronic cigarettes, and alternative nicotine products may be sold to and possessed by from at least 18 years of age to at least 21 years of age. Defines "electronic cigarette". Repeals the Smokeless Tobacco Limitation Act. Amends various other Acts to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOBACCO PRODUCTS-UNDER 21

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23553-12Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-16.1Amended CodeCitation Text
351306Amended CodeCitation Text
3514310-25Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-615Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-710Amended CodeCitation Text
7206750.01Amended CodeCitation Text
7206751Amended CodeCitation Text
7206751.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
7206752Amended CodeCitation Text
720675Act titleAmended CodeCitation Text
72067710Amended CodeCitation Text
72067715Amended CodeCitation Text
7206775Amended CodeCitation Text
7206781Amended CodeCitation Text
7206785Amended CodeCitation Text
7206786Amended CodeCitation Text
7206787Amended CodeCitation Text
7206788Amended CodeCitation Text
720680ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
7206852Amended CodeCitation Text
7206854Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback