IL HB3191 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the University of Illinois Hospital Act, the Nursing Home Care Act, the ID/DD Community Care Act, the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act, and the Hospital Licensing Act. Requires the University of Illinois Hospital and other hospitals to adopt an influenza and pneumococcal immunization policy that includes procedures for offering immunization against influenza virus when available between September 1 and April 1, and against pneumococcal disease upon admission or discharge, to patients unless contraindicated (removes language limiting the provision to patients age 65 or older). Provides that the immunizations shall be offered in accordance with the recommendations of the Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention that are most recent to the time of vaccination. Provides that long term care facilities, ID/DD facilities, and specialized mental health rehabilitation facilities shall administer or arrange for administration of a pneumococcal vaccination to each resident (instead of each resident who is age 65 and over).
Title
NURS HOME-HOSPTL-FLU-VACCINATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0271 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-001-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-04-11 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jil Tracy |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 330 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 2-213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 47 | 2-213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 48 | 2-213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 6.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |