IL HB3189 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
FINANCE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-02-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 062-047-000 | |
2010-02-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2010-02-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-02-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2010-02-10 | Chair Rules Motion Lost | |
2010-02-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-02-10 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 062-047-000 | |
2010-02-10 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2010-02-10 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-02-10 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2010-02-10 | Chair Rules Motion Lost | |
2010-02-10 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-02-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Rules Committee; Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-02-10 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-04-29 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-04-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-04-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-04-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2009-04-29 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 069-048-000 | |
2009-04-29 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2009-04-29 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. Tom Cross | |
2009-04-29 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2009-04-29 | Chair Rules Lost | |
2009-04-29 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-04-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Rules Committee; Rep. Tom Cross | |
2009-04-29 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 069-048-000 | |
2009-04-29 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2009-04-29 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. Tom Cross | |
2009-04-29 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2009-04-29 | Chair Rules Motion Lost | |
2009-04-29 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-04-29 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. Tom Cross | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-13 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-03-09 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-03-09 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-09 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-03-03 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-23 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3189&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB3189.htm |