IL HB3182 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that, in a case involving dissolution of marriage, declaration of invalidity of marriage, allocation of parental responsibilities, or domestic violence, the court shall only appoint a guardian ad litem if the guardian ad litem has completed 20 hours of classroom training and 20 hours of training by a domestic abuse advocate to become a guardian ad litem. Provides that a statewide organization advocating for survivors of domestic violence shall offer the training to become a guardian ad litem.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMDMA-GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseTo Family Law Subcommittee
2019-03-27HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-03-27HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-004-000; FAILED
2019-03-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-03-06HouseTo Family Law Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7505506Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback