IL HB3175 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0479
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0479
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Sets forth the General Assembly's findings concerning breast cancer patient education. Provides that the Director of Public Health shall provide for the planning and implementation of an education campaign to inform breast cancer patients, especially those in racial and ethnic minority groups, anticipating surgery regarding the availability and coverage of breast reconstruction, prostheses, and other options. Provides that the campaign shall include the dissemination, at a minimum, on relevant State health Internet websites, including the Department of Public Health's Internet website, of certain information. Provides that beginning no later than 2 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act and continuing each second year thereafter, the Director shall submit to the General Assembly a report describing the activities carried out under the provision concerning breast reconstruction education during the preceding 2 fiscal years, including evaluating the extent to which the activities have been effective in improving the health of racial and ethnic minority groups.
Title
IDPH-BREAST CANCER EDUCATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0479 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-001-000 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-02-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-02-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-02-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kay Hatcher |