IL HB3174 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Human Services (Department) to enter into an agreement with the Illinois Department of Corrections (IDOC) to allow the Department's database of public aid recipients to cross-reference with IDOC's database of incarcerated persons. Provides that public aid recipients who are inmates at a State correctional facility operated by IDOC shall be subject to an immediate suspension of their public aid benefits, including the immediate deactivation of their electronic benefits card or LINK card provided under the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (formerly the Food Stamp Program), until the date of their scheduled release or discharge from the State correctional facility.
Title
PUBLIC AID-INMATES-SUSPEND AID
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2013-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2013-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2013-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2013-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2013-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2013-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2013-04-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2013-04-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2013-04-22 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Josh Harms |
2013-04-22 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2013-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2013-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2013-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Josh Harms |
2013-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2013-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2013-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Remains in Human Services Committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Human Services Committee; 007-005-000 |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b- | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3174&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3174.htm |