IL HB3165 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the training for Department of Juvenile Justice personnel shall include courses in restorative justice. Defines "restorative justice". Provides that the Department may adopt rules to implement the training, including the length and frequency of the courses and the curriculum for the courses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-DJJ-RESTORATIVE JUSTIC

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0157
2017-08-18HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Restorative Justice Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-2.5-40.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback