IL HB3159 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Sets forth additional information that a school must report to the State Board of Education with respect to children receiving a required dental examination.
Title
SCH CD-DENTAL EXAMINATION DATA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 69 N: 34 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0390 |
2015-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2015 |
2015-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 069-034-009 |
2015-05-31 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-05-31 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 020-004-000 |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-05-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2015-05-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Morrison |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 006-000-000 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-003-003 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-004-000 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2015 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-018-000 |
2015-04-21 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-04-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-03-26 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-03-26 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-003-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |