IL HB3157 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Agriculture Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois . Provides that the Department of Agriculture shall identify and track geographical areas in this State that are food deserts. Provides that the Department shall notify respective municipal governmental bodies identified as food deserts and provide an annual report to the General Assembly detailing the locations of food deserts within the State and an analysis of health impacts on populations in locations identified in this State as food deserts. Defines "food desert".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGRICULTURE-FOOD DESERTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-24HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 098-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-25HouseArrived in House
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter
2017-05-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-27HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Economic Justice & Equity Committee; 008-000-000
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Economic Justice & Equity Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Economic Justice & Equity Committee; 006-001-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Economic Justice & Equity Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Justice & Equity Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Economic Justice & Equity Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20205205-48New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3157&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3157.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3157eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3157enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3157ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3157ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3157sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3157_04272017_037000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB3157_05252017_044000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3157_06252017_018000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback