IL HB3157 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1963 and the Drug Asset Forfeiture Procedure Act. Provides that within 14 days of seizure, the State shall seek a preliminary determination from the circuit court as to whether there is probable cause that the property may be subject to forfeiture. Provides that, upon making a finding of probable cause, the circuit court shall enter a restraining order or injunction or take other appropriate action to ensure that the property is not removed from the court's jurisdiction and is not concealed, destroyed, or otherwise disposed of by the property owner or interest holder before a forfeiture hearing is conducted. Provides that judicial in rem forfeiture proceedings may be instituted if the value of the non-real property exceeds $150,000 (rather than $20,000), excluding the value of any conveyance.
Title
FORFEITURE-PRELIMINARY-FINDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-04-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-12 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2011-03-31 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 36-1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 150 | 3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 150 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |