IL HB3152 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community college districts in Illinois. Allows universities and community colleges to establish a digital discount program that complies with federal regulations. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-DIGITAL DISCOUNT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-42.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3152&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3152.htm |