IL HB3152 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Provides that anytime during the year, the township road district may dispose of personal property by a vote of the township board or request of the township highway commissioner. Effective immediately.
Title
TWP CD-PERSONAL PROPERTY
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Ramey [R] | Rep. Franco Coladipietro [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Rep. Dennis Reboletti [R] |
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Rep. Al Riley [D] | Sen. William Haine [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0337 |
2011-08-12 | House | Effective Date August 12, 2011 |
2011-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2011 |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2011-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 1 | 30-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |