IL HB3151 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits intimidation when, with intent to cause another to perform or to omit the performance of any act, he or she communicates to another, directly or indirectly by any means, a threat to perform without lawful authority publish sexually explicit images of another person without consent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-INTIMIDATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-03SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-005-003
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback