IL HB3150 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Assigned to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Removes a repeal date of June 1, 2018 in a Section concerning a county recorder's ability to establish procedures for investigating filings that would cause the recorder to reasonably believe that the filing may be fraudulent, unlawfully altered, or intended to unlawfully cloud or transfer the title of any real property. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTIES-FRAUD REFERRAL REVIEW

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-07SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5553-5010.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback