IL HB3142 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Criminal History in College Applications Act. Provides that a public college may not inquire about or consider an applicant's criminal history information at any time during the admission decision-making process, except as required by State or federal law. Allows public colleges to continue using a multi-institution application, even if the application inquires about criminal history, but requires the public college to disregard the information for the admissions process. Allows public colleges to inquire about criminal history for certain purposes after the admission decision-making process, but forbids public colleges from rescinding an admissions offer based on the information. Authorizes public colleges to provide certain information. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM HISTORY IN COLLEGE APPS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-24SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-19SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-09SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-04-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-13SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-049-000
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-30HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 014-004-001
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback