IL HB3115 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Renewable Gas and Low-Carbon Fuels Act. Provides that a public utility that provides natural gas distribution services in the State shall incorporate low-carbon fuels into its gas supply portfolio. Provides for goals for the total amount of renewable gas and other low-carbon fuels incorporated by the natural gas utility. Provides that for purposes of meeting the goals, low-carbon fuels that are purchased by the natural gas utility must include environmental commodities associated with the gas. Provides that a natural gas utility may seek authorization from the Illinois Commerce Commission to engage in low-carbon fuels activities. Provides that the Commission shall approve a low-carbon fuels activity if it determines the low-carbon fuels activity investment and expenses are consistent with the provisions of the Act and the natural gas utility has demonstrated that the low-carbon fuels activity provides one or more specified benefits. Provides that the Commission shall review and, by order, approve, or approve as modified, the natural gas utility's low-carbon fuels activity proposal within 180 days after the date on which it is filed. Provides that the Commission shall adopt rules governing filing requirements, reporting requirements, and the process for natural gas utilities to fully recover prudently incurred costs associated with low-carbon fuels activity. Provides that all environmental commodities from low-carbon fuels resulting from the purchase of low-carbon fuels for gas supply or the ownership of a low-carbon fuels facility shall be applied to the benefit of gas customers. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to allow the Illinois Commerce Commission to adopt emergency rules. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RENEWABLE GAS/LOW-CARBON FUELS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-04-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2021-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 025-000-000
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Eva Dina Delgado

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51005-45.8New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback