IL HB3113 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0457
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0457
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission may issue an interim order to authorize or require any public utility to curtail or discontinue service and otherwise regulate the furnishing of service in specified emergency circumstances, effective for a period not exceeding 45 days (rather than 15 days), if the circumstances do not reasonably permit the holding of a hearing.
Title
UTILITIES-ICC INTERIM ORDER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0457 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Public Utilities Committee; 025-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 8-508 | Amended Code | Citation Text |