IL HB3099 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Trust Act. Provides that no law enforcement agency may detain or continue to detain any individual solely on the basis of any immigration detainer or administrative warrant, or otherwise comply with an immigration detainer or administrative warrant, after that individual becomes eligible for release from custody. Provides that a law enforcement official or other law enforcement agency personnel shall not give an immigration agent access to an individual or allow an immigration agent to use law enforcement agency facilities for investigative interviews or other investigative purposes; transfer a person into an immigration agent's custody; permit federal Immigration and Customs Enforcement agents' use of agency facilities, information, or equipment, including an agency's electronic database for investigative interviews or other investigative purpose or for purposes of executing an immigration enforcement operation; or respond to immigration agent inquiries regarding an individual's incarceration status, release date, or contact information except insofar as the agency makes that information available to the public. Amends the Police Training Act. Requires the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board to conduct or approve a training program on federal U and T nonimmigrant visas and other federal immigration remedies for immigrant victims of qualifying criminal activity. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Makes changes in provisions concerning special immigrant juvenile status. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that no person subject to an immigration detainer or administrative warrant shall be denied bail solely on the basis of that immigration detainer or administrative warrant. Makes changes in provisions concerning post-conviction proceedings. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
IMMIGRATION-STATE ENFORCEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 705 | 10.17-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
705 | 405 | 2-4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 550 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 110-5.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 113-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 122-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 122-2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 110 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3099&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3099.htm |