IL HB3099 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Forest Preserve District Act. Provides that if the boundaries of a district are co-extensive with the boundaries of a county having a population of more than 800,000 but less than 3,000,000, the county board shall serve as the district board of commissioners of the district beginning the day after the 2018 general election. Provides that terms of the district commissioners elected prior to the effective date of this amendatory Act shall be extended until the day of the 2018 general election. Further provides that the president or chairman of the county board shall appoint an environmental liaison to the county board who shall advise the county board on environmental issues and other duties as defined by the county board. The environmental liaison shall be appointed only after the president or chairman consults with and is advised by the local branch of a non-profit, member supported, environmental organization that is governed nationally by a fifteen-member board of directors. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FOREST PRESERVE-DISTRICT BOARD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 805 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 805 | 3c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 805 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |