IL HB3093 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Boards Article of the School Code. Allows any high school district whose territory is in 2 counties and that is eligible for Federal Impact Aid to make a one-time declaration as to interest income not previously declared from 1998 through 2011 in the debt service fund, declaring said moneys as interest earnings on or before June 30, 2016. Requires any such earnings income to thereafter be considered interest earnings. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-INTEREST EARNINGS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0404 |
2015-08-19 | House | Effective Date August 19, 2015 |
2015-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-002-000 |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jim Durkin |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Radogno |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-003 |
2015-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |