IL HB3093 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act. In the provision concerning eligibility, provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, in cooperation with the Department of Human Services, shall develop and implement procedures in administration of the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Program to require certain proofs of eligibility from applicants; cross reference income reported by applicants; and require the termination of coverage if certain premiums have not been paid pursuant to a grace period. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ALL KIDS - ELIGIBILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2011-03-17HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2011-02-28HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2011-02-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2011-02-23HouseFirst Reading
2011-02-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21517020Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback