IL HB3092 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. In provisions governing the notice and response in a case involving types of charges other than those pertaining to real estate transactions, removes the requirement that a response be verified. Provides that the charging party and the respondent may each file a position statement and other materials with the Department of Human Rights regarding the charge of alleged discrimination within 60 days of receipt of the request by the Department (instead of "within 60 days of receipt of notice of the charge"). Provides that the Department may (instead of "shall") require the respondent to file a response to the allegations contained in the charge within 60 days of receipt of the notice of the charge. Provides that all allegations contained in the charge not timely denied by the respondent may (instead of "shall") be deemed admitted, unless the respondent states that it is without sufficient information to form a belief with respect to the allegation. Provides that within 30 days of receipt of the respondent's response, the complainant may file a reply to the response and may (instead of "shall") serve a copy of the reply on the respondent or the respondent's representative. Provides that a party may (instead of "shall have the right to") supplement the response or reply at any time that the investigation of the charge is pending. Makes similar changes in provisions governing the notice and response in other types of charges arising under the Act. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMAN RIGHTS-CHARGE PROCEDURES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-08HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0492
2017-09-08HouseEffective Date September 8, 2017
2017-09-08HouseGovernor Approved
2017-07-24HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 099-000-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-26HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2017-05-25HouseArrived in House
2017-05-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-05-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-05-12SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-03-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-08HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-08HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000
2017-02-24HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77557A-102Amended CodeCitation Text
77557B-102Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3092&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3092.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3092eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3092enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0492.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3092ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3092sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3092sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3092_03302017_013000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB3092_05252017_034000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3092_06252017_017000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback