IL HB3092 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Adds language providing that a law enforcement officer must offer a chemical test to any person who the officer has reason to believe operated a vehicle that was involved in a type A personal injury or fatal motor vehicle accident. In language providing that a person who drives or is in actual control of a motor vehicle upon the public highways of this State and who has been involved in a type A personal injury or fatal motor vehicle accident is deemed to have given consent to a breath test or chemical test for alcohol or drugs, deletes language limiting that consent to situations where the person is arrested. Effective July 1, 2011.
Title
VEH CD-DUI TESTING-ACCIDENTS
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Franks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | House | Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-03-02 | House | Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2011-03-01 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-501.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3092&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3092.htm |